NJ S3277 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands municipal authority to license and inspect residential rental property. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands municipal authority to license and inspect residential rental property. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4764 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-19AssemblyPocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
2016-01-11AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-27-3)
2016-01-11AssemblySubstituted for A4764 (2R)
2016-01-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2016-01-07SenatePassed by the Senate (22-16)
2015-12-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2015-12-10SenateTransferred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
2015-12-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4764 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3277 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback