NJ S3239 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.114.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.114.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates portion of US Highway Route 40 in Upper Pittsgrove Township as "John R. Elliott HERO Campaign Way."
Title
Designates portion of US Highway Route 40 in Upper Pittsgrove Township as "John R. Elliott HERO Campaign Way."
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D] |
Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4889 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.114. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A4889 (1R) |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4889 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by S3239 (1R)