NJ S3232 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4705 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Substituted by A4705 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Food Waste Task Force to make recommendations concerning food waste in New Jersey.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Food Waste Task Force to make recommendations concerning food waste in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Substituted by A4705 (3R) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4705 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.92.