NJ S3228 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4184

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Statewide Hit and Run Advisory Program to facilitate apprehension of persons fleeing motor vehicle accident scene; designated as "Zackhary's Law."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Statewide Hit and Run Advisory Program to facilitate apprehension of persons fleeing motor vehicle accident scene; designated as "Zackhary's Law."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-06SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-12-06SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-12-03SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1477 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4184 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback