NJ S3216 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2387
Note: Carry Foward to future S2118
Note: Carry Foward to future S2118
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns application of residential rental property inspection findings in rental assistance determinations and eviction actions.
Title
Concerns application of residential rental property inspection findings in rental assistance determinations and eviction actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-0) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Stack) |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3216 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S3216 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A5331 (Same As) 2017-12-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S3216 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A5331 (Same As) 2017-12-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee