NJ S3207 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Passed by the Senate (29-6)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes new timeframes for implementation of, and revises, certain requirements in "Global Warming Response Act." *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes new timeframes for implementation of, and revises, certain requirements in "Global Warming Response Act." *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenatePassed by the Senate (29-6)
2019-03-14SenateSenate Amendment (24-0) (Smith)
2019-02-21SenateSenate Amendment (26-0) (Smith)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-12-03SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-12-03SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-11-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4821 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback