NJ S3206 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.318.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.318.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Unbanked and Underbanked Consumers Study Commission."
Title
Establishes "Unbanked and Underbanked Consumers Study Commission."
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4835 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.318. |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-2-0) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A4835 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4835 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S3206