NJ S3203 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.40.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.40.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires in person early voting period for certain elections; makes appropriation.
Title
Requires in person early voting period for certain elections; makes appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4830 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4830 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.40. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-8) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (58-11-1) |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Substituted for A4830 (2R) |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (27-10) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment (23-0) (Gill) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4830 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S3203 (SCS/2R)