NJ S3191 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S753
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4529 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4529 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns reimbursements to Superstorm Sandy-impacted homeowners subjected to contractor fraud.
Title
Concerns reimbursements to Superstorm Sandy-impacted homeowners subjected to contractor fraud.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Robert Andrzejczak [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Chris Brown [R] |
Sen. Christopher Connors [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A4529 (1R) |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3191 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4529 (1R)
A4529 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.485.
A4529 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.485.