NJ S3169 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides tax credit eligibility for qualified businesses at certain airports under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides tax credit eligibility for qualified businesses at certain airports under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-01-05SenatePassed by the Senate (33-0)
2017-12-18SenateSenate Amendment (29-0) (Van Drew)
2017-12-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-11-30SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-11-30SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-05-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4959 (Same As) 2017-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback