NJ S3163 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2134
Note: Carry Over of previous S841
Note: Carry Over of previous S841
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Department of Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion as principal department in Executive Branch and specifies functions, powers, and duties of department.
Title
Establishes Department of Diversity, Equity, and Inclusion as principal department in Executive Branch and specifies functions, powers, and duties of department.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A856 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2134 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S841 (Carry Over) 2022-06-23 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2134 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S841 (Carry Over) 2022-06-23 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S3163 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3500/3163_I1.HTM |