NJ S3149 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1491
Note: Carry Foward to future A4070
Note: Carry Foward to future A4070
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4784 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4784 (4R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes process for recovery of Superstorm Sandy aid overpayments and makes General Fund appropriation.*
Title
Establishes process for recovery of Superstorm Sandy aid overpayments and makes General Fund appropriation.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Substituted by A4784 (4R) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Turner) |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3149 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4784 (4R)
S3149 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4784 (4R)
A4784 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
S3149 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by A4784 (4R)
A4784 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)