NJ S3118 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes public awareness campaign to promote early conversations about advance care planning and end-of-life care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes public awareness campaign to promote early conversations about advance care planning and end-of-life care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-06-10SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2019-05-13SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-10-18SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4682 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback