NJ S3110 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an industrial hemp license.
Title
Establishes an industrial hemp license.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Rep. Concetta Wagner [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Linda Stender [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2415 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2415 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-8-0) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A2415 |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2415 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S3110