NJ A2415 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S3110
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes an industrial hemp license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes an industrial hemp license.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-13AssemblySubstituted by S3110
2013-12-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2013-11-25AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2012-02-06AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3110 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback