NJ S3102 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tax credit eligibility for qualified businesses for certain persons employed as independent contractors under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program.
Title
Provides tax credit eligibility for qualified businesses for certain persons employed as independent contractors under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Sen. James Whelan [D] | Rep. Vincent Mazzeo [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] |
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4926 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-4-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A4926 (1R) |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (28-6) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Whelan) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4926 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3102 (1R)