NJ A4926 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3102 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S3102 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tax credit eligibility for qualified businesses for certain persons employed as independent contractors under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program.
Title
Provides tax credit eligibility for qualified businesses for certain persons employed as independent contractors under Grow New Jersey Assistance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted by S3102 (1R) |
2017-12-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3102 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-4-0)