NJ S3089 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2817
Note: Carry Over of previous S3016
Note: Carry Over of previous S3016
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes time constraints on submission and analysis of rape kits.
Title
Imposes time constraints on submission and analysis of rape kits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3753 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2817 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3016 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2817 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3016 (Carry Over) 2022-09-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S3089 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3500/3089_I1.HTM |