NJ S3086 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on September 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-20 - Substituted by A4978 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-20 - Substituted by A4978 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Division of Violence Intervention and Victim Assistance in Department of Law and Public Safety.
Title
Establishes Division of Violence Intervention and Victim Assistance in Department of Law and Public Safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Substituted by A4978 (1R) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4978 (Same As) 2023-10-17 - Approved P.L.2023, c.167.