NJ S3086 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A3783 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A3783 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns disclosure and reimbursement procedures of board of education and municipal employee health care benefit contracts.
Title
Concerns disclosure and reimbursement procedures of board of education and municipal employee health care benefit contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. James Whelan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A3783 (1R) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3783 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S3086 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3500/3086_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3500/3086_R1.HTM |