NJ S3085 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A4927 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases duration and weekly amount of family temporary disability benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases duration and weekly amount of family temporary disability benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26SenateSubstituted by A4927 (ACS)
2017-06-15SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2017-06-12SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-03-13SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2261 (Same As) 2016-05-23 - Withdrawn from Consideration
A4857 (Same As) 2017-05-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A4927 (Same As) 2017-07-31 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback