NJ A4927 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-31 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 26 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-31 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises law concerning family leave, temporary disability and family temporary disability leave, and domestic or sexual violence safety leave.*
Title
Revises law concerning family leave, temporary disability and family temporary disability leave, and domestic or sexual violence safety leave.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S3085 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 23 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Regulatory Oversight Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-31 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (22-15) |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Substituted for S3085 (SCS) |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-23-3) |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | INT 1RA REF ARO |
Same As/Similar To
S3085 (Same As) 2017-06-26 - Substituted by A4927 (ACS)