NJ S3082 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Angelie's Law"; regulates the operation of certain autobuses.*
Title
"Angelie's Law"; regulates the operation of certain autobuses.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4546 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4546 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.224. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-2-0) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A4546 (1R) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-0) (Sacco) |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4546 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S3082 (1R)