NJ S3067 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.137.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.137.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of Education to develop guidelines for school districts regarding transgender students.
Title
Requires Commissioner of Education to develop guidelines for school districts regarding transgender students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4652 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.137. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (59-15-3) |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A4652 |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (25-10) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4652 (Same As) 2017-06-29 - Substituted by S3067