NJ S3062 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1860
Note: Carry Over of previous S3836
Note: Carry Over of previous A5467
Note: Carry Over of previous S3836
Note: Carry Over of previous A5467
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates affirmative defense for certain breaches of security.
Title
Creates affirmative defense for certain breaches of security.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3062 (Carry Over) 2020-10-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A3984 (Same As) 2020-05-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S3836 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A5467 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
A3984 (Same As) 2020-05-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
S3836 (Carry Over) 2019-06-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A5467 (Carry Over) 2019-06-06 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S3062 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S3500/3062_I1.HTM |