NJ S3028 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes standards for food date labeling; requires Commissioner of Health to establish public education program and promulgate guidelines related to food safety.
Title
Establishes standards for food date labeling; requires Commissioner of Health to establish public education program and promulgate guidelines related to food safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Samuel Thompson [R] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] |
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-14) |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Smith) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4633 (Same As) 2017-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee