NJ S3000 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.276.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.276.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies and establishes certain network adequacy standards for pediatric primary and specialty care in Medicaid program.
Title
Codifies and establishes certain network adequacy standards for pediatric primary and specialty care in Medicaid program.
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4688 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4688 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.276. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-3) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A4688 (3R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4688 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3000 (4R)