NJ S3 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-7)
Status: Passed on February 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Approved P.L.2017, c.28.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health insurance coverage for treatment of substance use disorders; places certain restrictions on the prescription of opioid and certain other drugs; concerns continuing education related thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires health insurance coverage for treatment of substance use disorders; places certain restrictions on the prescription of opioid and certain other drugs; concerns continuing education related thereto.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.28.
2017-02-15AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (64-1-5)
2017-02-15AssemblySubstituted for A3 (1R)
2017-02-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-02-06SenatePassed by the Senate (33-0)
2017-01-30SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-01-30SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S3 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback