NJ S2997 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.66.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.66.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $59,532,000 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for State acquisition of lands for recreation and conservation purposes, including Blue Acres projects, and capital and park development projects.
Title
Appropriates $59,532,000 from constitutionally dedicated CBT revenues for State acquisition of lands for recreation and conservation purposes, including Blue Acres projects, and capital and park development projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4597 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.66. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Substituted for A4597 |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4597 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S2997 (1R)