NJ S2992 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Approved P.L.2019, c.36.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for horse racing purse subsidies and that portion of sums received by the horse racing permit holder from sports wagering will be paid to horsemen's associations pursuant to agreement with racetrack; makes appropriation.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for horse racing purse subsidies and that portion of sums received by the horse racing permit holder from sports wagering will be paid to horsemen's associations pursuant to agreement with racetrack; makes appropriation.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4810 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.36.
2019-01-31SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2019-01-31SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (68-6-1)
2019-01-31AssemblySubstituted for A4810 (1R)
2019-01-28AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-12-10SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-09-24SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4810 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2992 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback