NJ S2969 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Substituted by A4202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Substituted by A4202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increase gross income tax rate on income exceeding $1,000,000 for taxable years 2011 and 2012 and expands gross income tax exclusion for pensions, annuities and other retirement income for certain taxpayers beginning in 2011.
Title
Increase gross income tax rate on income exceeding $1,000,000 for taxable years 2011 and 2012 and expands gross income tax exclusion for pensions, annuities and other retirement income for certain taxpayers beginning in 2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-29 | Substituted by A4202 | |
2011-06-27 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-23 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4202 (Same As) 2011-11-10 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/S2969 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/S3000/2969_I1.HTM |