NJ S2967 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A943
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A943
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits small businesses to qualify for loans from NJEDA for costs of energy audit and making energy efficiency or conservation improvements.
Title
Permits small businesses to qualify for loans from NJEDA for costs of energy audit and making energy efficiency or conservation improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted by A943 |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-11-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-11-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A943 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session