NJ S2963 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Note: Legislation replaced by A1355

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Substituted by A1355 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires DOH to provide information about crib safety on its Internet website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires DOH to provide information about crib safety on its Internet website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-10-19 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-12-17SenateSubstituted by A1355 (1R)
2015-10-19SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2015-06-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4669 (Same As) 2015-06-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A1355 (Replaced by) 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.198.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback