NJ S2960 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides State information tecnology contracts will require use of software to document computer use by contractor.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides State information tecnology contracts will require use of software to document computer use by contractor.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07SenateRecommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-01-31SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-09-17SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3989 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Senate Amendment (27-0) (Sarlo)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback