NJ A3989 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides State information technology contracts will require use of software to document computer use by contractor.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides State information technology contracts will require use of software to document computer use by contractor.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2960 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-01-13SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2020-01-13SenateSubstituted for S2960 (1R)
2019-02-21SenateSenate Amendment (27-0) (Sarlo)
2019-02-07SenateReceived in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-1)
2018-12-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-05-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2960 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A3989 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback