NJ S295 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3254
Note: Carry Over of previous S3254
Note: Carry Over of previous S3254
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved P.L.2017, c.88.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved P.L.2017, c.88.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to issue standing order authorizing pharmacists to dispense opioid antidotes to patients without individual prescriptions.*
Title
Requires DOH to issue standing order authorizing pharmacists to dispense opioid antidotes to patients without individual prescriptions.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2334 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2334 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.88. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Substituted for A2334 (1R) |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3254 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2334 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S295 (1R)
S3254 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A2334 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S295 (1R)
S3254 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee