NJ S2934 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-12-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires MVC to accept emergency medical technician and paramedic certification cards as two points of documentation for purposes of MVC identification verification program.
Title
Requires MVC to accept emergency medical technician and paramedic certification cards as two points of documentation for purposes of MVC identification verification program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4478 (Same As) 2017-01-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee