NJ S2919 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4370
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by A4370
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases membership of board of trustees of Washington Association of New Jersey.
Title
Increases membership of board of trustees of Washington Association of New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A4370 |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4370 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.482.