NJ S2919 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-22 - Substituted by A4307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-22 - Substituted by A4307
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases required public notice from 30 days to 60 days for settlements entered into by DEP pursuant to Spill Compensation and Control Act.
Title
Increases required public notice from 30 days to 60 days for settlements entered into by DEP pursuant to Spill Compensation and Control Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-08 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-22 | Senate | Substituted by A4307 |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4307 (Same As) 2015-12-02 - Approved P.L.2015, c.166.