NJ S2894 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A4165 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires driver education course, certain new driver brochures, and driver's license written exam to include cyclist and pedestrian safety information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires driver education course, certain new driver brochures, and driver's license written exam to include cyclist and pedestrian safety information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-05SenateSubstituted by A4165 (2R)
2017-12-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-06-01SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-06-01SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2017-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4165 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback