NJ A4165 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1476
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires driver education course, certain new driver brochures, and driver's license written exam to include cyclist and pedestrian safety information. *
Title
Requires driver education course, certain new driver brochures, and driver's license written exam to include cyclist and pedestrian safety information. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2894 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2894 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0) |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Substituted for S2894 (1R) |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-0-2) |
2016-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4165 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (69-0-0)
S2894 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A4165 (2R)
S2894 (Same As) 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A4165 (2R)