NJ S2883 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S142
Note: Carry Foward to future A4341
Note: Carry Over of previous S2187
Note: Carry Over of previous A4133
Note: Carry Foward to future A4341
Note: Carry Over of previous S2187
Note: Carry Over of previous A4133
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modernizes business filing statutes to include entity conversion and domestication.
Title
Modernizes business filing statutes to include entity conversion and domestication.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2883 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2883 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3513 (Same As) 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2187 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4133 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2883 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3513 (Same As) 2020-08-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2187 (Carry Over) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4133 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2883 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S3000/2883_I1.HTM |