NJ S2868 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4533
Note: Carry Over of previous S3487
Note: Carry Over of previous S3487
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the "New Jersey Feminine Hygiene Product Donations Immunity Act."
Title
Establishes the "New Jersey Feminine Hygiene Product Donations Immunity Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2004 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4533 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3487 (Carry Over) 2023-01-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A4533 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3487 (Carry Over) 2023-01-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2868 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2868_I1.HTM |