NJ S2855 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A495
Note: Carry Over of previous S1640
Note: Carry Over of previous S1640
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends eligibility for Military Dependents Scholarships to students enrolled in approved career and technical education programs and to dependents of certain military members who served in Operation Freedom's Sentinel and Operation Inherent Resolve.
Title
Extends eligibility for Military Dependents Scholarships to students enrolled in approved career and technical education programs and to dependents of certain military members who served in Operation Freedom's Sentinel and Operation Inherent Resolve.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1140 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A495 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1640 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A495 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
S1640 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2855 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2855_I1.HTM |