NJ S2845 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Substituted by A4406 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-07 - Substituted by A4406 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for emergency assistance to individuals or families that are homeless or in temporary living arrangement due to domestic violence.
Title
Provides for emergency assistance to individuals or families that are homeless or in temporary living arrangement due to domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-20 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-07 | Senate | Substituted by A4406 (1R) |
2017-11-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4406 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.273.