NJ S2839 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-5)
Status: Enrolled on October 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-10-29 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Makes General Fund supplemental appropriation of $250,000 to New Jersey Manufacturing Extension Program, Inc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes General Fund supplemental appropriation of $250,000 to New Jersey Manufacturing Extension Program, Inc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4315 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-29AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
2018-10-29AssemblySubstituted for A4315
2018-10-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
2018-09-27SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2018-09-24SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-07-23SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4315 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S2839

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback