NJ S2821 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Approved P.L.2013, c.149.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-19 - Approved P.L.2013, c.149.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes to the Urban Hope Act including the financing and siting of renaissance school projects.
Title
Makes various changes to the Urban Hope Act including the financing and siting of renaissance school projects.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 18 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4194 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4194 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.149. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (48-18-8) |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted for A4194 (2R) |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (33-0) |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4194 (Same As) 2013-06-27 - Substituted by S2821 (1R)