NJ S2808 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A4175 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Substituted by A4175 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of Education to develop guidance on identifying English language learners for gifted and talented programs.
Title
Requires Commissioner of Education to develop guidance on identifying English language learners for gifted and talented programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Substituted by A4175 (1R) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-11-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4175 (Same As) 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.171.