NJ S2793 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases from 17 to 21 public members of New Jersey State Council on the Arts; requires members to be residents of NJ; imposes specific criteria for four new members initially appointed.*
Title
Increases from 17 to 21 public members of New Jersey State Council on the Arts; requires members to be residents of NJ; imposes specific criteria for four new members initially appointed.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3962 Aa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (58-16-0) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A3962 (1R) |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-07-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-9) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3962 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S2793 (1R)