NJ S2789 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A4477 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A4477 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises licensure, operational, and reporting requirements for nursing homes.
Title
Revises licensure, operational, and reporting requirements for nursing homes.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Substituted by A4477 (2R) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate Amendment (23-0) (Vitale) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4477 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.95.